U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Labrie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • April 02, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 02, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 02, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment - For Public]
  • March 20, 2025: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
  • March 19, 2025: [Quash ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.