U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steadman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 01, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 01, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • April 01, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 10, 2025: [Appear]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.