U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [PSIReferred]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 20, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 20, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 17, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 10, 2025: [Dismiss ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.