U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cr-00099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nash
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 26, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 24, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Transcript]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 10, 2025: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.