U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tivao
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 25, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 20, 2025: [Appear]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
  • March 13, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.