U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Steffensen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • April 11, 2025: [Trial Scheduling Conference]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 01, 2025: [Right to Speedy Trial Act/FSA Acknowledgment & Waiver]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order]
  • March 31, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 28, 2025: [Vacate ]
  • March 25, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.