U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kibby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Status Conference]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 17, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • March 13, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 11, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.