U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-mj-00183-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anfilofev
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • April 03, 2025: [Transcript]
  • April 02, 2025: [Reconsideration ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Transcript Request (USDCA 435) (Non-Appeal)]
  • March 30, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order]
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SEALED pdf]
  • March 12, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Extradition Hearing ]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 20, 2025: [Expedite ]
January, 2025
  • January 10, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
October, 2024
  • October 24, 2024: [Expedite ]
  • October 16, 2024: [Order of Detention]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2024: [Transcript]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.