U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:22-mj-00563-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hinze
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Docket Annotation - Indictment Filed]
  • January 18, 2023: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 06, 2023: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 06, 2023: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • January 04, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2023: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • January 04, 2023: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.