U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-mj-00091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Commitment to Another District]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)]
  • November 04, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 04, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Arrest]
  • October 31, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.