U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00353
  • Case Name: Marlon Ulysses Kelly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion AND Notice of Hearing (Combined Obj Deadline and Hrg Date)]
  • January 13, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Exhibit To]
  • January 12, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Exhibit To]
  • January 11, 2023: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments (Hrg Rqd, FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM12)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
  • July 28, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • June 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
  • June 06, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
  • February 16, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
January, 2021
  • January 30, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 28, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
January, 2020
  • January 29, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • January 27, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • January 22, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • January 16, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • January 13, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
December, 2019
  • December 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • December 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • November 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • November 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • November 12, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • November 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • November 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • November 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.