U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00328
  • Case Name: Lesli Fae Brandt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 24, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 22, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Redact]
  • December 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • December 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Redact (Fee)]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 23, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • January 06, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
December, 2019
  • December 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • December 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • November 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • November 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAfterHrg) (SA)]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Hearing on UST Standing Mtn to Dismiss (CM14-COAwith)]
  • November 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • November 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.