U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00221
  • Case Name: Brenda L Davis and Johnny R Davis
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 23, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Court Remark Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement]
August, 2019
  • August 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Reaffirmation Agreement (With Atty Signature) (BKRA01)]
  • August 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • August 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • August 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)]
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Matrix]
  • August 07, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Amended Creditor Matrix AND Amended Schedules (Fee)]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 17, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.