U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00217
  • Case Name: Jeremiah S Dolan and Rebecca Lynn Dolan
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • October 17, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • October 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Enter Chapter 13 Discharge]
  • September 13, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Report of Unclaimed Funds / Funds Less than 5 dollars]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
  • July 15, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Response to Notice of Final Cure Payment Rule 3002.1 (g)]
  • July 12, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Final Cure Mortgage Payment - 3002.1(f)]
May, 2021
  • May 14, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
April, 2020
  • April 01, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Change of Address for Creditor]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • October 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • October 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • October 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • October 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • October 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • September 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • August 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Continue / Reschedule Hearing]
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.