U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00182
  • Case Name: Matthew Allen Conner
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 27, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • July 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.