U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 19-00180
  • Case Name: Dominique O'Connor
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 12, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • August 02, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • July 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • July 09, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • June 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Clerks Notice of Fees Due (Not Deferred)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping(7), Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • June 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.