U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00207
  • Case Name: Ben Hur F Corpus and Mary Joanne Corpus
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Attorney]
  • August 03, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • November 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
August, 2019
  • August 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change (Form 410S1)]
November, 2018
  • November 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
  • November 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • October 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • October 24, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • October 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • October 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • October 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • October 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Withdrawal of Document / Motion]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • September 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
August, 2018
  • August 30, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • August 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan (CM45-COAwith)]
  • August 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - CH 11, 12 & 13)]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
  • July 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • July 13, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • July 12, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • July 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • July 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping(13), Nacole M. [OSC Referral Re: Statement of Social Security (Form 121)]
  • July 05, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [OSC Referral Re: Statement of Social Security (Form 121)]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • July 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Petition Review Completed]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [QC Remark Re: Incorrect Image]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [QC - Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • July 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.