U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 18-00193
  • Case Name: Estela Salome Marin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • September 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Discharging Debtor(s) (SA) (BNC Notice)]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
July, 2018
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (pro-memo - Ch 7 Only)]
  • July 27, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • June 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 22, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Petition Review Completed]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF 38)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • June 21, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Battley, Kenneth W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.