U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00034
  • Case Name: Perkins v. Stars and Stripes Realty, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2017
  • June 01, 2017: [Order]
  • June 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • May 25, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 22, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • May 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • May 12, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 09, 2017: [Reconsideration]
April, 2017
  • April 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 28, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 27, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 26, 2017: [Witness List]
  • April 20, 2017: [Order]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 28, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 21, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • February 07, 2017: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • February 07, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 02, 2017: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 01, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 30, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 23, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • January 21, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 17, 2017: [Affidavit]
  • January 17, 2017: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 12, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 12, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 06, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 03, 2017: [Vacate]
  • January 03, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • December 27, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [Order]
  • December 20, 2016: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 20, 2016: [Joinder to Motion]
  • December 16, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • December 12, 2016: [Witness List]
  • December 09, 2016: [Witness List]
November, 2016
  • November 28, 2016: [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
  • November 23, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • November 23, 2016: [Notice Re: Chamber Copy]
  • November 22, 2016: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • November 17, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 16, 2016: [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
  • November 15, 2016: [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
  • November 11, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2016: [Order]
  • November 08, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2016: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 04, 2016: [Returned/Undeliverable Mail]
  • November 03, 2016: [Extension of Time to File Document]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Service List]
  • October 19, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2016: [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
  • October 14, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 14, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.