U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00238
  • Case Name: Galle v. United States of America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2017
  • May 08, 2017: [Order]
  • May 05, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
March, 2017
  • March 14, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 10, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 09, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • March 02, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • February 01, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
January, 2017
  • January 19, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 17, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • January 17, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 12, 2017: [Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer)]
  • January 09, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 05, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 04, 2017: [Jury Demand]
  • January 04, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 12, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 12, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.