U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cv-00033
  • Case Name: Manley v. United States
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2017
  • August 02, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • July 05, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Dismiss]
May, 2017
  • May 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • May 25, 2017: [Stay]
  • May 23, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 23, 2017: [Summary Judgment]
  • May 04, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
April, 2017
  • April 11, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • April 05, 2017: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
March, 2017
  • March 31, 2017: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2017
  • February 09, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Order]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2016: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 12, 2016: [Filing Fee Received]
  • October 12, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 12, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.