U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00237
  • Case Name: Pacheco v. Thompson et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • January 16, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 05, 2018: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 04, 2018: [Status Report]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Order]
  • December 05, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • December 04, 2017: [Status Report]
November, 2017
  • November 07, 2017: [Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 02, 2017: [Status Report]
September, 2017
  • September 06, 2017: [Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Settlement]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2017
  • June 15, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2017
  • April 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 29, 2017: [Counterclaim]
  • March 09, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • March 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 08, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
February, 2017
  • February 21, 2017: [Order]
  • February 17, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • February 17, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • February 09, 2017: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • February 03, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2017
  • January 24, 2017: [Affidavit of Service]
  • January 24, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • January 20, 2017: [Clerk's Text Notice of Deficiency (Answer)]
  • January 10, 2017: [Unissued Summons]
  • January 05, 2017: [Supplement]
  • January 03, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2016
  • December 30, 2016: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • December 27, 2016: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 22, 2016: [Acknowledgment of Service]
  • December 22, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 06, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
  • December 04, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2016
  • November 15, 2016: [Order]
  • November 15, 2016: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 07, 2016: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem]
October, 2016
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 24, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 18, 2016: [Order]
  • October 13, 2016: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 12, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • October 12, 2016: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • October 11, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • October 11, 2016: [Complaint]
  • October 11, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.