U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:16-cv-00015
  • Case Name: Fishbone Rentals LLC et al v. Liberty Northwest et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • November 02, 2017: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
September, 2017
  • September 08, 2017: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • September 06, 2017: [Stay]
May, 2017
  • May 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • May 25, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2016
  • December 15, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 12, 2016: [Response to Order]
November, 2016
  • November 29, 2016: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 18, 2016: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2016
  • October 28, 2016: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Order]
  • October 25, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 20, 2016: [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
  • October 04, 2016: [Notice of Service List]
  • October 04, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • October 03, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.