U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00224
  • Case Name: Carr Gottstein Properties, L.P. v. Seritage Growth Properties, L.P. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Order]
  • July 11, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
May, 2018
  • May 24, 2018: [Status Report]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 26, 2018: [Status Report]
January, 2018
  • January 26, 2018: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [Status Report]
  • January 03, 2018: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Status Report]
  • September 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Status Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Withdraw]
May, 2017
  • May 30, 2017: [Status Report]
April, 2017
  • April 17, 2017: [Order]
  • April 17, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 06, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • April 04, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
March, 2017
  • March 30, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
  • March 30, 2017: [Status Report]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • March 29, 2017: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 20, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • March 17, 2017: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • March 13, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 06, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
February, 2017
  • February 24, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 22, 2017: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction]
  • January 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2016
  • December 28, 2016: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 28, 2016: [Declaration]
  • December 28, 2016: [Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected]
  • December 27, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 27, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 23, 2016: [Leave to File Document]
  • December 16, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • December 02, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 02, 2016: [Reply to Response to Motion]
November, 2016
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice Re: Chamber Copy]
  • November 10, 2016: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • November 10, 2016: [Stay]
  • November 09, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
October, 2016
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2016: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • October 26, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 26, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • October 26, 2016: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 21, 2016: [Order on Stipulation]
  • October 14, 2016: [Stipulation]
  • October 12, 2016: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 12, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 12, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2016: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 10, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • October 05, 2016: [Order]
  • October 05, 2016: [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
September, 2016
  • September 29, 2016: [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney using Pay.gov]
  • September 21, 2016: [Affidavit]
  • September 21, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • September 21, 2016: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 21, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • September 21, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 21, 2016: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.