U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:16-cv-00221
  • Case Name: Thorpe v. Bank of America N.A. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
August, 2018
  • August 31, 2018: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order on Stipulation]
  • August 08, 2018: [Stipulation]
June, 2018
  • June 13, 2018: [Witness List]
  • June 12, 2018: [Witness List]
May, 2018
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Compel]
  • May 16, 2018: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 09, 2018: [Declaration]
  • May 09, 2018: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2018
  • April 25, 2018: [Compel]
December, 2017
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 12, 2017: [Protective Order]
November, 2017
  • November 09, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting]
October, 2017
  • October 12, 2017: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
  • September 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
May, 2017
  • May 17, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 11, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 03, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
April, 2017
  • April 19, 2017: [Strike]
  • April 19, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 19, 2017: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 19, 2017: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 17, 2017: [Order on Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • April 12, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2017
  • March 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2017: [Docket Annotation re Non-Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2]
  • March 29, 2017: [Declaration]
  • March 29, 2017: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 23, 2017: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2017: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • March 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2017: [Errata]
  • March 07, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 01, 2017: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 01, 2017: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • March 01, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 01, 2017: [Memorandum]
  • March 01, 2017: [Judgment on the Pleadings]
February, 2017
  • February 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • February 22, 2017: [Order on Stipulation]
  • February 16, 2017: [Order]
  • February 16, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 15, 2017: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 14, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 14, 2017: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 14, 2017: [Stipulation]
January, 2017
  • January 25, 2017: [Declaration]
  • January 25, 2017: [Strike]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • January 12, 2017: [Order on Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • January 11, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • January 11, 2017: [Substitute Attorney]
  • January 11, 2017: [Docket Annotation re Incomplete/Unreadable PDF]
  • January 10, 2017: [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
  • January 10, 2017: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
December, 2016
  • December 29, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2016: [Memorandum]
  • December 21, 2016: [Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2016: [Order to Show Cause (Answer)]
  • December 12, 2016: [Order]
  • December 05, 2016: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 01, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2016
  • November 22, 2016: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2016: [Unissued Summons]
  • November 22, 2016: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 21, 2016: [Jury Demand]
  • November 21, 2016: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 21, 2016: [Additional Related Document]
  • November 21, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 18, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 18, 2016: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 16, 2016: [Order on Stipulation]
  • November 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2016
  • October 13, 2016: [Order]
  • October 12, 2016: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2016: [Clerks Notice Approving Non-Resident Attorney Application]
  • October 11, 2016: [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
  • October 07, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 05, 2016: [Receipt For Non-Resident Attorney Fee]
  • October 03, 2016: [Declaration]
  • October 03, 2016: [Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney]
  • October 03, 2016: [Order]
September, 2016
  • September 30, 2016: [Order on Stipulation]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2016: [Notice of Service List]
  • September 20, 2016: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
  • September 19, 2016: [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
  • September 19, 2016: [Notice of Removal]
  • September 19, 2016: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.