U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goza
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 08, 2015: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • December 08, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
November, 2015
  • November 23, 2015: [Amended Judgment]
  • November 23, 2015: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • November 19, 2015: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
  • November 09, 2015: [Amend/Correct ]
  • November 06, 2015: [Judgment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sealed Statement of Reasons - Sealed pdf]
  • November 06, 2015: [Arraignment]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2015: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 06, 2015: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF]
  • November 06, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 05, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum Supplement - SEALED PDF]
  • November 05, 2015: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 05, 2015: [Order]
  • November 05, 2015: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 05, 2015: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 05, 2015: [Plea Agreement Addendum - SEALED PDF]
  • November 04, 2015: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Unopposed Motion]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 30, 2015: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 01, 2015: [Summons Returned Executed ]
September, 2015
  • September 14, 2015: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.