U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:23-mc-04003
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Marchand et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2023
  • August 18, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2023
  • June 21, 2023: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
May, 2023
  • May 04, 2023: [Acknowledgment of Service]
April, 2023
  • April 19, 2023: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 18, 2023: [Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement]
  • April 18, 2023: [Application for Writ of Garnishment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.