U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama

alabama Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Alabama
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gray et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 15, 2021: [Order]
  • March 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Parties]
  • March 12, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing]
  • March 10, 2021: [Remark]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Remark]
  • February 11, 2021: [CVB Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2021: [Petty Offense Docket Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.