U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Connecticut

connecticut Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Connecticut
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 16-20954
  • Case Name: Larry D. Hewitt and Brunilda Hewitt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2016
  • October 11, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [AutoClose Bankruptcy Case]
September, 2016
  • September 23, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
  • September 20, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Discharging Debtor - auto docket]
  • September 03, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Reassign Judge]
  • September 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Relief from Stay]
August, 2016
  • August 05, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Relief from Stay]
  • August 01, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2016
  • July 23, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • July 07, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Debtor's Certification Re Financial Management Course Completion]
June, 2016
  • June 24, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • June 16, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Financial Management Course Certificate - eFinCert]
  • June 15, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • June 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Form 122]
  • June 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
  • June 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [none]
  • June 13, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mangan, Bonnie C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.